Find all School-related info fast with the new School-Specific MBA Forum

It is currently 30 Aug 2014, 20:57

Close

GMAT Club Daily Prep

Thank you for using the timer - this advanced tool can estimate your performance and suggest more practice questions. We have subscribed you to Daily Prep Questions via email.

Customized
for You

we will pick new questions that match your level based on your Timer History

Track
Your Progress

every week, we’ll send you an estimated GMAT score based on your performance

Practice
Pays

we will pick new questions that match your level based on your Timer History

Not interested in getting valuable practice questions and articles delivered to your email? No problem, unsubscribe here.

Events & Promotions

Events & Promotions in June
Open Detailed Calendar

is there a shortcut to quickly calculate a square of a

  Question banks Downloads My Bookmarks Reviews Important topics  
Author Message
TAGS:
CEO
CEO
User avatar
Joined: 21 Jan 2007
Posts: 2770
Location: New York City
Followers: 6

Kudos [?]: 217 [0], given: 4

GMAT Tests User
is there a shortcut to quickly calculate a square of a [#permalink] New post 15 May 2007, 21:38
is there a shortcut to quickly calculate a square of a number? let's say 28 squared...
Senior Manager
Senior Manager
User avatar
Joined: 03 May 2007
Posts: 279
Followers: 1

Kudos [?]: 7 [0], given: 0

GMAT Tests User
 [#permalink] New post 15 May 2007, 21:41
i'd just multiply it 28*28 it's a pretty quick method :-D
Manager
Manager
User avatar
Joined: 30 Mar 2007
Posts: 222
Followers: 1

Kudos [?]: 2 [0], given: 0

GMAT Tests User
 [#permalink] New post 15 May 2007, 21:45
there is no shortcut to success :-D ..

but for few squares there is
9998^2

(10000-2)^2 now apply a^2+b^2-2*a*b

any other inputs
VP
VP
User avatar
Joined: 08 Jun 2005
Posts: 1157
Followers: 6

Kudos [?]: 110 [0], given: 0

GMAT Tests User
 [#permalink] New post 15 May 2007, 23:20
apache wrote:
there is no shortcut to success :-D ..

but for few squares there is
9998^2

(10000-2)^2 now apply a^2+b^2-2*a*b

any other inputs


nice ! thanks apache.

:-D
Director
Director
User avatar
Joined: 26 Feb 2006
Posts: 908
Followers: 3

Kudos [?]: 36 [0], given: 0

GMAT Tests User
Re: shortcut for squares? [#permalink] New post 15 May 2007, 23:28
bmwhype2 wrote:
is there a shortcut to quickly calculate a square of a number? let's say 28 squared...


= (30 - 2)^2
= 900 - 120 + 4= 784
CEO
CEO
User avatar
Joined: 21 Jan 2007
Posts: 2770
Location: New York City
Followers: 6

Kudos [?]: 217 [0], given: 4

GMAT Tests User
Re: shortcut for squares? [#permalink] New post 18 May 2007, 16:30
Himalayan wrote:
bmwhype2 wrote:
is there a shortcut to quickly calculate a square of a number? let's say 28 squared...


= (30 - 2)^2
= 900 - 120 + 4= 784


nice. but its more tedious than multiplying 28x28.
Current Student
User avatar
Joined: 22 Apr 2007
Posts: 1097
Followers: 5

Kudos [?]: 21 [0], given: 0

GMAT Tests User
 [#permalink] New post 18 May 2007, 20:59
Funny. Yesterday I was telling my wife how I calculated 97 x 97 in my mind (For a problem she was trying to solve). I obviously used (a-b)^2. But when I told how it's done, my wife said .. she'd rather multiply 97s :roll:
Director
Director
User avatar
Joined: 26 Feb 2006
Posts: 908
Followers: 3

Kudos [?]: 36 [0], given: 0

GMAT Tests User
Re: shortcut for squares? [#permalink] New post 18 May 2007, 21:45
bmwhype2 wrote:
Himalayan wrote:
bmwhype2 wrote:
is there a shortcut to quickly calculate a square of a number? let's say 28 squared...


= (30 - 2)^2
= 900 - 120 + 4= 784


nice. but its more tedious than multiplying 28x28.


what is the square of 57?

1. 3212
2. 3230
3. 3241
4. 3244
5. 3249

in this case you can easily pick 5 because 7 x 7 (unit digits) is 9. so we can take the clue like this. but if answer choices are all or some are with 9 as unit digits, then it is really time consuming and we should follow either formula or multiplication.....
Intern
Intern
avatar
Joined: 08 Oct 2006
Posts: 16
Followers: 0

Kudos [?]: 1 [0], given: 0

Re: shortcut for squares? [#permalink] New post 19 May 2007, 05:09
Hi,
This can be done using Vedic mathematics( though not required for GMAT) nevertheless please see below.

Example : Suppose we have to multiple 12 by 13

1. We multiply the left hand most digit 1 of the multiplicand vertically by the left hand most digit 1 of the multiplier , get their product as 1 and set it down as the left-hand-most part of the answer;
2. We then multiply 1and 3, and 1 and 2 cross-wise , add the two, get 5 as the sum and set it down ad the middle part of the answer ; and
3. We multiply 2 and 3 vertically , get 6 as their product and put it down as the last right-hand-most part of the answer.

Thus 12 x 13 = 156

12
13
___________
1:3+2:6=156

Coming back to the problem at hand we need 28 x 28

Answer is (2*2+ carry forward from prev) : (2*8 +2*8+ carry forward from prev): ( 8x8)

which is (4+carry):(16+16+6):4
or (4+3):84
or 784
Attachments

File comment: Vedic Math - multiplication
Vedic_math_multiplication.doc [30 KiB]
Downloaded 43 times

To download please login or register as a user

VP
VP
User avatar
Joined: 08 Jun 2005
Posts: 1157
Followers: 6

Kudos [?]: 110 [0], given: 0

GMAT Tests User
 [#permalink] New post 19 May 2007, 05:22
wow ! :shock:

thanks for sharing manish.gmat

on your behalf i add your link

http://tinyurl.com/3dzeyb



:-D
Director
Director
User avatar
Joined: 26 Feb 2006
Posts: 908
Followers: 3

Kudos [?]: 36 [0], given: 0

GMAT Tests User
Re: shortcut for squares? [#permalink] New post 19 May 2007, 08:56
manish.gmat wrote:
Hi,
This can be done using Vedic mathematics( though not required for GMAT) nevertheless please see below.

Example : Suppose we have to multiple 12 by 13

1. We multiply the left hand most digit 1 of the multiplicand vertically by the left hand most digit 1 of the multiplier , get their product as 1 and set it down as the left-hand-most part of the answer;
2. We then multiply 1and 3, and 1 and 2 cross-wise , add the two, get 5 as the sum and set it down ad the middle part of the answer ; and
3. We multiply 2 and 3 vertically , get 6 as their product and put it down as the last right-hand-most part of the answer.

Thus 12 x 13 = 156

12
13
___________
1:3+2:6=156

Coming back to the problem at hand we need 28 x 28

Answer is (2*2+ carry forward from prev) : (2*8 +2*8+ carry forward from prev): ( 8x8)

which is (4+carry):(16+16+6):4
or (4+3):84
or 784





KillerSquirrel wrote:
wow ! :shock:

thanks for sharing manish.gmat

on your behalf i add your link

http://tinyurl.com/3dzeyb



:-D



both are wonderful. thanks.
GMAT Forum Moderator
User avatar
Joined: 01 Nov 2007
Posts: 356
Schools: Wharton Class of 2011
Followers: 17

Kudos [?]: 76 [0], given: 14

GMAT Tests User
 [#permalink] New post 01 Nov 2007, 06:30
There is one method that yields accurate results for all numbers. It is especialy applicable to numbers less than 30, you can solve their squares without paper. For numbers over 30 it requiers just one multiplication with multiples of 10 which is quite straightforward. Here we go:

28^2 = (28+8)*20 + 8^2
= 36*20 + 64
= 720+64 = 784

Another example:

57^2 = (57+7)*50 + 7^2
= 64*50 + 49
= 3200 + 49 = 3249

And one more:

97^2 = (97+7)*90 + 7^2
= 104*90 + 49
at this point you may need a paper and pencil, but calculation is very straightforward since you have to multiply 1040 with 9
= 9360 + 49 = 9409

The strongest points of this technique are its simplicity and ability to calculate even most complicated numbers, even 13 or 14 digit numbers which i have to doubt anyone will ever see on actual test.
SVP
SVP
User avatar
Joined: 01 May 2006
Posts: 1816
Followers: 8

Kudos [?]: 88 [0], given: 0

GMAT Tests User
 [#permalink] New post 01 Nov 2007, 06:37
Pathfinder_77 wrote:
There is one method that yields accurate results for all numbers. It is especialy applicable to numbers less than 30, you can solve their squares without paper. For numbers over 30 it requiers just one multiplication with multiples of 10 which is quite straightforward. Here we go:

28^2 = (28+8)*20 + 8^2
= 36*20 + 64
= 720+64 = 784

Another example:

57^2 = (57+7)*50 + 7^2
= 64*50 + 49
= 3200 + 49 = 3249

And one more:

97^2 = (97+7)*90 + 7^2
= 104*90 + 49
at this point you may need a paper and pencil, but calculation is very straightforward since you have to multiply 1040 with 9
= 9360 + 49 = 9409

The strongest points of this technique are its simplicity and ability to calculate even most complicated numbers, even 13 or 14 digit numbers which i have to doubt anyone will ever see on actual test.


Interesting :)... Welcome to the GMATClub ! :)

To me... well... I prefer to do 57 * 57 by the usual way of calculating by hand :).... I mean I don't feel that I'm going less fast than by doing your technic :)
VP
VP
avatar
Joined: 28 Mar 2006
Posts: 1390
Followers: 2

Kudos [?]: 18 [0], given: 0

GMAT Tests User
 [#permalink] New post 01 Nov 2007, 19:19
All set and one one has to practice really hard to master the techniques. Other they may prove to counter your accuracy. :)
CEO
CEO
User avatar
Joined: 29 Aug 2007
Posts: 2501
Followers: 53

Kudos [?]: 500 [0], given: 19

GMAT Tests User
 [#permalink] New post 01 Nov 2007, 20:04
Thanks everybody for your methods and certainly it is nice to know new methods of calculation.

I liked this one because it is easy to multiply integers by 100: 97^2
= (100-3)^2
= 100^2 - 2x100x3 + 3^2
= 10,000 - 600 + 9
= 9,400 + 9
= 9,409
CEO
CEO
User avatar
Joined: 21 Jan 2007
Posts: 2770
Location: New York City
Followers: 6

Kudos [?]: 217 [0], given: 4

GMAT Tests User
 [#permalink] New post 18 Nov 2007, 03:41
GMAT TIGER wrote:
Thanks everybody for your methods and certainly it is nice to know new methods of calculation.

I liked this one because it is easy to multiply integers by 100: 97^2
= (100-3)^2
= 100^2 - 2x100x3 + 3^2
= 10,000 - 600 + 9
= 9,400 + 9
= 9,409


http://www.gmatclub.com/forum/t55624
  [#permalink] 18 Nov 2007, 03:41
    Similar topics Author Replies Last post
Similar
Topics:
1 SQUARE of any two digit number - shortcut toughmat 6 01 Jun 2011, 05:05
Experts publish their posts in the topic Shortcuts for simple calculations? Michmax3 1 09 Sep 2010, 18:07
Calculators GoMannschaftGo 9 23 Jun 2010, 18:39
Experts publish their posts in the topic calculators? phdprospect 7 01 Jun 2010, 09:58
3 To calculate matematikconsultant 7 24 Feb 2009, 02:20
Display posts from previous: Sort by

is there a shortcut to quickly calculate a square of a

  Question banks Downloads My Bookmarks Reviews Important topics  


cron

GMAT Club MBA Forum Home| About| Privacy Policy| Terms and Conditions| GMAT Club Rules| Contact| Sitemap

Powered by phpBB © phpBB Group and phpBB SEO

Kindly note that the GMAT® test is a registered trademark of the Graduate Management Admission Council®, and this site has neither been reviewed nor endorsed by GMAC®.