GMAT Question of the Day - Daily to your Mailbox; hard ones only

It is currently 15 Oct 2019, 14:42

Close

GMAT Club Daily Prep

Thank you for using the timer - this advanced tool can estimate your performance and suggest more practice questions. We have subscribed you to Daily Prep Questions via email.

Customized
for You

we will pick new questions that match your level based on your Timer History

Track
Your Progress

every week, we’ll send you an estimated GMAT score based on your performance

Practice
Pays

we will pick new questions that match your level based on your Timer History

Not interested in getting valuable practice questions and articles delivered to your email? No problem, unsubscribe here.

Close

Request Expert Reply

Confirm Cancel

In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The

  new topic post reply Question banks Downloads My Bookmarks Reviews Important topics  
Author Message
TAGS:

Hide Tags

Find Similar Topics 
Director
Director
User avatar
B
Status: I don't stop when I'm Tired,I stop when I'm done
Joined: 11 May 2014
Posts: 526
Location: Bangladesh
Concentration: Finance, Leadership
GPA: 2.81
WE: Business Development (Real Estate)
In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The  [#permalink]

Show Tags

New post 22 Jun 2017, 14:44
3
Top Contributor
70
00:00
A
B
C
D
E

Difficulty:

  85% (hard)

Question Stats:

60% (02:33) correct 40% (02:25) wrong based on 1528 sessions

HideShow timer Statistics

In the two-digit integers 3\(\Box\) and 2\(\bigtriangleup\),the symbols \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) represent different digits,and the product (3\(\Box\))(2\(\bigtriangleup\)) is equal to 864 .What digit does \(\Box\) represent ?

(1) The sum of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 10.
(2) The product of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 24

_________________
Md. Abdur Rakib

Please Press +1 Kudos,If it helps
Sentence Correction-Collection of Ron Purewal's "elliptical construction/analogies" for SC Challenges
Most Helpful Expert Reply
Target Test Prep Representative
User avatar
D
Status: Founder & CEO
Affiliations: Target Test Prep
Joined: 14 Oct 2015
Posts: 8048
Location: United States (CA)
Re: In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The  [#permalink]

Show Tags

New post 17 Nov 2017, 12:42
10
10
AbdurRakib wrote:
In the two-digit integers 3\(\Box\) and 2\(\bigtriangleup\),the symbols \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) represent different digits,and the product (3\(\Box\))(2\(\bigtriangleup\)) is equal to 864 .What digit does \(\Box\) represent ?

(1) The sum of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 10.
(2) The product of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 24


We know the product (3◻)(2△) is equal to 864. Let’s first factor 864:

864 = 8 x 108 = 2^3 x 9 x 12 = 2^3 x 3^2 x 2^2 x 3 = 2^5 x 3^3

We see that 2^5 = 32 and 3^3 = 27; so, △ could be 2 and ◻ could be 7.

However, we can have other pairs of numbers besides 32 x 27 that multiply to be 864.

For example, one number could be 2^2 x 3^2 = 4 x 9 = 36 and the other number could be 2^3 x 3^1 = 8 x 3 = 24. In this case, we have △ = 6 and ◻ = 4.

However, there will not be any other pairs of numbers besides 32 x 27 and 36 x 24 that multiply to 864. So, if 864 is a product of a 30-something number and a 20-something number, it must be 32 x 27 (with △ = 2 and ◻ = 7) or 36 x 24 (△ = 6 and ◻ = 4).

Statement One Alone:

The sum of ◻ and △ is 10.

This means △ = 6 and ◻ = 4, since the other option has △ + ◻ = 2 + 7 = 9. Statement one alone is sufficient.

Statement Two Alone:

The product of ◻ and △ is 24.

This means △ = 6 and ◻ = 4, since the other option has △ x ◻ = 2 x 7 = 14. Statement two alone is sufficient.

Answer: D
_________________

Scott Woodbury-Stewart

Founder and CEO

Scott@TargetTestPrep.com
TTP - Target Test Prep Logo
122 Reviews

5-star rated online GMAT quant
self study course

See why Target Test Prep is the top rated GMAT quant course on GMAT Club. Read Our Reviews

If you find one of my posts helpful, please take a moment to click on the "Kudos" button.

Math Expert
avatar
V
Joined: 02 Aug 2009
Posts: 7957
Re: In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The  [#permalink]

Show Tags

New post 24 Jun 2017, 21:54
4
2
AbdurRakib wrote:
In the two-digit integers 3\(\Box\) and 2\(\bigtriangleup\),the symbols \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) represent different digits,and the product (3\(\Box\))(2\(\bigtriangleup\)) is equal to 864 .What digit does \(\Box\) represent ?

(1) The sum of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 10.
(2) The product of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 24



Hi,

Various ways..
One as also given above is that 864 is MULTIPLE of just 2 and 3..
So what numbers in 30s are multiple of ONLY 2 and 3...
32 and 36...
1) 32..
Now 2 in 32 requires a 2 or 7 in units digit of 2∆..
But both are different so numbers are 32&27 and their product is 864...
2)36..
6 requires 4 or 9...
24 is MULTIPLE of 2s and 3s.. so ok
But 29 is not so out
Numbers are 36 and 24 and again product is 864..
So possible values 32*27 or 36*24

Now let's see the statements.
I) Sum of unit's digit is 10..
2+7 is 9 so 32*27 is out
6+4=10
Ans is 36*24
Suff
II) product of units digit is 24..
2*7=14.. 32*27 out
6*4=24
Ans is 36*24
Sufficient

D
_________________
Most Helpful Community Reply
Intern
Intern
avatar
Joined: 20 Jul 2017
Posts: 1
Re: In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The  [#permalink]

Show Tags

New post 08 Aug 2017, 23:08
33
7
(3◻)(2△) = 864
Write it like this :
(30 + ◻)(20 + △) = 864
60 + 30△ + 20◻ + ◻△ = 864

Statement 1: The sum of ◻ and △ is 10.
So ◻ + △ = 10
So ◻ = 10 - △
Replace in 60 + 30△ + 20◻ + ◻△ = 864 the value ◻ by 10 - △
And then it is a simple equation.

Statement 2: The product of ◻ and △ is 24
So ◻ and △ are different from 0
So ◻ = 24/△
Replace in 60 + 30△ + 20◻ + ◻△ = 864 the value ◻ by 24/△
And again it s a simple equation.

So D
General Discussion
Intern
Intern
avatar
B
Joined: 20 Jun 2016
Posts: 4
Location: United States (MA)
Concentration: Finance, Technology
Schools: Carroll '20
GMAT 1: 650 Q40 V38
GPA: 3.25
GMAT ToolKit User
Re: In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The  [#permalink]

Show Tags

New post 22 Jun 2017, 20:33
1
1
AD
BCE

From the question stem we know that ◻ and △ are single, non-negative integers.
We also see that 864 = (\(3^3\)) * (\(2^5\)), so whatever '3◻' and '2△' are they must have prime factors of only 2 and 3.

1) The sum of ◻ and △ is 10 - our symbols can be pairs of: ( {1, 9}, {2, 8}, {3, 7}, {4, 6}, {5, 5} )

Testing
31 and 29: 31 is prime, this can't be an option
39 and 21: 21 = 3 * 7, thus this can't be an option
32 and 28: 28 = \(2^2\) * 7, thus this can't be an option
38 and 22: 22 = 2 * 11, thus this can't be an option
33 and 27: 33 = 3 * 11, thus this can't be an option
37 and 23: 37 is prime, this can't be an option
34 and 26: 26 = 2 * 13, this can't be an option
36 and 24: both numbers end up with only 2 and 3 as prime factors, option valid
35 and 25: 35 = 5 * 7, this can't be an option

Combining the information from the question stem with the information from Statement 1 leaves us with 1 option - Sufficient BCE

2) The product of ◻ and △ is 24 - our symbols can be pairs of: ( {3, 8} and {4, 6} )

Testing
33 and 28: 33 = 3 * 11, thus this can't be an option
38 and 23: 23 is prime, this can't be an option
34 and 26: 26 = 2 * 13, thus this can't be an option
36 and 24: both numbers end up with only 2 and 3 as prime factors, option valid

Combining the information from the question stem with the information from Statement 2 leaves us with one option - Sufficient A

Choice D
-------
This took me far too long though to answer though. :|
Is there an easier means of testing our various number combinations like this? In hindsight I likely should've written down the numbers from 20 to 29 and 30 to 39 which prime factors were only 2 and 3, and then compared those options with each statement from there:

{24, 27, 32, 36} vs Statement 1
{24, 27, 32, 36} vs Statement 2
Intern
Intern
avatar
B
Joined: 16 Apr 2008
Posts: 4
Re: In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The  [#permalink]

Show Tags

New post 24 Jun 2017, 20:40
10
1
1
AbdurRakib wrote:
In the two-digit integers 3\(\Box\) and 2\(\bigtriangleup\),the symbols \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) represent different digits,and the product (3\(\Box\))(2\(\bigtriangleup\)) is equal to 864 .What digit does \(\Box\) represent ?

(1) The sum of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 10.
(2) The product of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 24


Last digit of 864 is 4. Now we need to multiply the last 2 digits of these 2 numbers.
From 1 : sum is 10. Only 4 and 6 satisfies. Sufficient
From 2 : last 2 digits could be 3,8 and 4,6. Now making 23 and 38 or 28 and 33 does not end up to 864. So 4,6 left. Sufficient.

hence D.
Intern
Intern
avatar
B
Joined: 28 Apr 2016
Posts: 16
Re: In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The  [#permalink]

Show Tags

New post 25 Jun 2017, 18:13
864 = 2*2*2*2*2*3*3*3.
As per the question the only factors possible with tens digit 2_ and 3_ are 24 and 36 or 27 and 32.
Either condition is sufficient.
Manager
Manager
avatar
G
Joined: 04 Apr 2015
Posts: 218
Reviews Badge
Re: In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The  [#permalink]

Show Tags

New post 15 Aug 2017, 08:39
1
we know multiplication ends in 4 so options of last digits : (3,8) , (1,4) ,(8,8) ,(6,4)
statement 1: sum 10 so only 6,4 possible sufficient
statement 2 : product 24 so 3,8 and 6,4 but we know product 864 so check the values : only 6,4 gives the answer
hence both are sufficient therefore D
Intern
Intern
User avatar
B
Joined: 01 Oct 2017
Posts: 13
Concentration: Marketing, Technology
GMAT 1: 700 Q44 V41
GPA: 4
Re: In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The  [#permalink]

Show Tags

New post 01 Oct 2017, 17:46
Can't this be solved without using any of the given two statements?
The information given in the initial statement is already sufficient to arrive at one unique solution? The following statements are just helping us by easing it down.

Sent from my XT1053 using GMAT Club Forum mobile app
Intern
Intern
avatar
B
Joined: 12 Jul 2017
Posts: 1
Re: In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The  [#permalink]

Show Tags

New post 24 Oct 2017, 02:44
It can be 4 and 6 or 6 and 4, how can you be sure about which one of those is the square..
Intern
Intern
User avatar
B
Joined: 20 Oct 2017
Posts: 1
Re: In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The  [#permalink]

Show Tags

New post 14 Jun 2018, 02:23
1
AbdurRakib wrote:
In the two-digit integers 3\(\Box\) and 2\(\bigtriangleup\),the symbols \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) represent different digits,and the product (3\(\Box\))(2\(\bigtriangleup\)) is equal to 864 .What digit does \(\Box\) represent ?

(1) The sum of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 10.
(2) The product of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 24



Let \(\Box\) be x and \(\bigtriangleup\) be y.
Hence, 3\(\Box\)= 30+x & 2\(\bigtriangleup\)= 20+y.
As given (30+x)(20+y)=864
or, 20x+30y+xy+600-864=0
or, 20x+30y+xy-264=0.....................(Equation 1)

Now,
1)The sum of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 10.
x+y=10
y=10-x
the above (Equation 1) will become two degree solvable equation.
20x+ 30(10-x)+x (10-x)-264=0
20x+300-30x+10x-x^2-264=0
x^2=36
x=+6 or -6 (-ve can not be possible as per question stem).
Sufficient

2) The product of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 24[/quote]
x*y=24
y=24/x
the above (Equation 1) will become two degree solvable equation.
20x+ 30(24/x)+x (24/x)-264=0
x^2 -12x +36=0
x=+6 or -6 (-ve can not be possible as per question stem)
Sufficient


Answer: D
VP
VP
User avatar
D
Joined: 09 Mar 2016
Posts: 1230
In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The  [#permalink]

Show Tags

New post 17 Aug 2018, 04:19
ScottTargetTestPrep wrote:
AbdurRakib wrote:
In the two-digit integers 3\(\Box\) and 2\(\bigtriangleup\),the symbols \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) represent different digits,and the product (3\(\Box\))(2\(\bigtriangleup\)) is equal to 864 .What digit does \(\Box\) represent ?

(1) The sum of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 10.
(2) The product of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 24


We know the product (3◻)(2△) is equal to 864. Let’s first factor 864:

864 = 8 x 108 = 2^3 x 9 x 12 = 2^3 x 3^2 x 2^2 x 3 = 2^5 x 3^3

We see that 2^5 = 32 and 3^3 = 27; so, △ could be 2 and ◻ could be 7.

However, we can have other pairs of numbers besides 32 x 27 that multiply to be 864.

For example, one number could be 2^2 x 3^2 = 4 x 9 = 36 and the other number could be 2^3 x 3^1 = 8 x 3 = 24. In this case, we have △ = 6 and ◻ = 4.

However, there will not be any other pairs of numbers besides 32 x 27 and 36 x 24 that multiply to 864. So, if 864 is a product of a 30-something number and a 20-something number, it must be 32 x 27 (with △ = 2 and ◻ = 7) or 36 x 24 (△ = 6 and ◻ = 4).

Statement One Alone:

The sum of ◻ and △ is 10.

This means △ = 6 and ◻ = 4, since the other option has △ + ◻ = 2 + 7 = 9. Statement one alone is sufficient.

Statement Two Alone:

The product of ◻ and △ is 24.

This means △ = 6 and ◻ = 4, since the other option has △ x ◻ = 2 x 7 = 14. Statement two alone is sufficient.

Answer: D


Dear ScottTargetTestPrep

Greetings from a math passionate gmatclub user ! :)

Nice explanation, just one question I have :-)

Okay we made a prime factorization its clear so far

864 = 8 x 108 = 2^3 x 9 x 12 = 2^3 x 3^2 x 2^2 x 3 = 2^5 x 3^3

We see that 2^5 = 32 and 3^3 = 27; so, △ could be 2 and ◻ could be 7.

But suddenly you take a dramatic unpredictable turn,... its like using handbrake in Ferrari :) you are pro and I am just an amateur driver, beginner :grin: :lol: so you say "However, we can have other pairs of numbers besides 32 x 27 that multiply to be 864.

For example, one number could be 2^2 x 3^2 = 4 x 9 = 36 and the other number could be 2^3 x 3^1 = 8 x 3 = 24.
"

But how can I figure it out (another combination) so quickly under time constraint ? :? I would appreciate if you could get the chance to explain it :-)

thank you and have a nice weekend :-)

Dave :-)
Intern
Intern
avatar
B
Joined: 23 Aug 2017
Posts: 26
Re: In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The  [#permalink]

Show Tags

New post 11 Oct 2018, 05:50
1
AbdurRakib wrote:
In the two-digit integers 3\(\Box\) and 2\(\bigtriangleup\),the symbols \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) represent different digits,and the product (3\(\Box\))(2\(\bigtriangleup\)) is equal to 864 .What digit does \(\Box\) represent ?

(1) The sum of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 10.
(2) The product of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 24


I think I found a way to solve without any calculation:

We may say that 3\(\Box\) equals 30 + \(\Box\) and 2\(\bigtriangleup\) equals 20 + \(\bigtriangleup\), then we have this equation (30 + \(\Box\)) * (20 + \(\bigtriangleup\)) = 864, in other words, we have one equation with two variables. We need just one more not equivalent equation with these two variables to find \(\Box\).

Each of the statements give me a not equivalent equation with the variables \(\bigtriangleup\) and \(\Box\), then each of them are sufficient. Option D.
Director
Director
avatar
P
Joined: 29 Jun 2017
Posts: 929
Re: In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The  [#permalink]

Show Tags

New post 17 Feb 2019, 19:17
let say a and b are the number presented by square and angle.
a+b=10, but the product has unit number of 4. so, there are the following case
a=6, b=4, or a=4 b=6
now we plug in these number to see one of them make product of 864. that is simple
Director
Director
avatar
G
Joined: 09 Mar 2018
Posts: 996
Location: India
Re: In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The  [#permalink]

Show Tags

New post 17 Feb 2019, 19:50
AbdurRakib wrote:
In the two-digit integers 3\(\Box\) and 2\(\bigtriangleup\),the symbols \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) represent different digits,and the product (3\(\Box\))(2\(\bigtriangleup\)) is equal to 864 .What digit does \(\Box\) represent ?

(1) The sum of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 10.
(2) The product of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 24


Lets do prime factorization of 864, Once done we get

\(2^5 * 3^3\)

We can get 864 by 36*24 or 32*27, there are other pairs as well, but those pairs don't help us

from 1) only one case satisfies the condition, 36*24

from 2) only one case satisfies the condition, 36*24

D
_________________
If you notice any discrepancy in my reasoning, please let me know. Lets improve together.

Quote which i can relate to.
Many of life's failures happen with people who do not realize how close they were to success when they gave up.
Senior Manager
Senior Manager
User avatar
P
Joined: 10 Apr 2018
Posts: 267
Location: United States (NC)
In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The  [#permalink]

Show Tags

New post 23 Apr 2019, 16:58
1
dave13 wrote:
ScottTargetTestPrep wrote:
AbdurRakib wrote:
In the two-digit integers 3\(\Box\) and 2\(\bigtriangleup\),the symbols \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) represent different digits,and the product (3\(\Box\))(2\(\bigtriangleup\)) is equal to 864 .What digit does \(\Box\) represent ?

(1) The sum of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 10.
(2) The product of \(\Box\) and \(\bigtriangleup\) is 24


We know the product (3◻)(2△) is equal to 864. Let’s first factor 864:

864 = 8 x 108 = 2^3 x 9 x 12 = 2^3 x 3^2 x 2^2 x 3 = 2^5 x 3^3

We see that 2^5 = 32 and 3^3 = 27; so, △ could be 2 and ◻ could be 7.

However, we can have other pairs of numbers besides 32 x 27 that multiply to be 864.

For example, one number could be 2^2 x 3^2 = 4 x 9 = 36 and the other number could be 2^3 x 3^1 = 8 x 3 = 24. In this case, we have △ = 6 and ◻ = 4.

However, there will not be any other pairs of numbers besides 32 x 27 and 36 x 24 that multiply to 864. So, if 864 is a product of a 30-something number and a 20-something number, it must be 32 x 27 (with △ = 2 and ◻ = 7) or 36 x 24 (△ = 6 and ◻ = 4).

Statement One Alone:

The sum of ◻ and △ is 10.

This means △ = 6 and ◻ = 4, since the other option has △ + ◻ = 2 + 7 = 9. Statement one alone is sufficient.

Statement Two Alone:

The product of ◻ and △ is 24.

This means △ = 6 and ◻ = 4, since the other option has △ x ◻ = 2 x 7 = 14. Statement two alone is sufficient.

Answer: D


Dear ScottTargetTestPrep

Greetings from a math passionate gmatclub user ! :)

Nice explanation, just one question I have :-)

Okay we made a prime factorization its clear so far

864 = 8 x 108 = 2^3 x 9 x 12 = 2^3 x 3^2 x 2^2 x 3 = 2^5 x 3^3

We see that 2^5 = 32 and 3^3 = 27; so, △ could be 2 and ◻ could be 7.

But suddenly you take a dramatic unpredictable turn,... its like using handbrake in Ferrari :) you are pro and I am just an amateur driver, beginner :grin: :lol: so you say "However, we can have other pairs of numbers besides 32 x 27 that multiply to be 864.

For example, one number could be 2^2 x 3^2 = 4 x 9 = 36 and the other number could be 2^3 x 3^1 = 8 x 3 = 24.
"

But how can I figure it out (another combination) so quickly under time constraint ? :? I would appreciate if you could get the chance to explain it :-)

thank you and have a nice weekend :-)

Dave :-)


Hi dave13

I dont know if your question is answered.
But here is what i would do .

864=\(2^{5}3^{3}\)

Since one number is in its 20's So ( 20, 21,22,23,25,26,28, 29) cannot be the numbers 23 and 29 are prime and 864 does not have any other prime as its factors except 2 & 3. On the samelines we can reject 20 =5*4, 21=7*3, 22=11*2 and so on

So we are left with 24 and 27

Similarly numbers in 30's we can reject ( 30, 31,33,34,35,37,38, 39) so we are left with 32 and 36

OK
Then we have two statements and we can figure out which combination is true.

Hope this helps
_________________
Probus

~You Just Can't beat the person who never gives up~ Babe Ruth
Manager
Manager
avatar
B
Joined: 04 Dec 2015
Posts: 146
WE: Operations (Commercial Banking)
In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The  [#permalink]

Show Tags

New post 02 Jun 2019, 08:02
okay so.. 3a * 2b = 864 where a and b are the units digits of the integers 3a and 2b respectively.

statement 1 : a+b =10 ....now focus on the unit digit of 864 ie 4. We need 4 as the unit digit so only possible choices are 6 & 4 or 4 & 6... ie 36*24 or 34*26... clearly, 36*24 is the only possible case as 34*26=864.. Hence a=6, sufficient.

statement 2 : a*b=24 ... ie again we have two cases 36*24 or 34*26... clearly, 36*24 is the only possible case as 34*26=864.. Hence a=6, sufficient.

Hence both statement 1 and statement 2 are sufficient.

Answer D.
GMAT Club Bot
In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The   [#permalink] 02 Jun 2019, 08:02
Display posts from previous: Sort by

In the two-digit integers 3[m]\Box[/m] and 2[m]\bigtriangleup[/m],The

  new topic post reply Question banks Downloads My Bookmarks Reviews Important topics  





Powered by phpBB © phpBB Group | Emoji artwork provided by EmojiOne